Dudgeon v. Sonoma et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Dudgeon
Defendant: Matthias Williams, Brent Kidder, City of Sonoma, County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth, Kensell Williams, Randy Williams, George Minaglia and Mark Essick
Case Number: 3:2019cv05615
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order, signed 11/19/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #67 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Schedule. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Designation of Experts due by 4/30/2021. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/14/2021. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 6/25/2021 09:30 AM in Videoconference Only before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2020)
November 18, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL SCHEDULE filed by County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth. (King, Michael) (Filed on 11/18/2020)
November 16, 2020 Filing 66 Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2020. Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2021 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management State ment due by 2/19/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2021 02:00 PM in Videoconference Only.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Seville, Vincent Barrientos. Defendant Attorney: Michael King. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2020)
November 5, 2020 Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth. (King, Michael) (Filed on 11/5/2020)
October 14, 2020 Filing 64 Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 10/14/2020 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Case did not settle.FTR Time: Not Recorded. Plaintiff Attorneys: Michael Ryan Seville, Vincent L Barrientos, and Curtis L. Briggs. Defendant Attorney: Michael Alcock King. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2020)
September 23, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kara Ann Abelson (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
August 26, 2020 Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2020.Jury Selection set for 9/13/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 for five (5) days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/26/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2020)
August 21, 2020 Filing 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 8/21/2020. Court set trial dates as set forth. (Not Reported). Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.Jury Selection set for 9/13/2021 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco,Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Jury Trial set for 9/13/2021 - 9/16/2021 and 9/20/2021 at 8:30 AM inSan Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Plaintiff's Attorney: Michael Seville. Defendants' Attorney: Kara Abelson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2020)
August 13, 2020 Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 8/13/2020)
August 10, 2020 Filing 59 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: The settlement Conference is set for 10/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #57 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Schedule and Deadline to Attend Settlement Conference. Close of Expert Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Designation of Experts due by 1/15/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 2/1/2021. Dispositive Motion and Dauber Hearing set for 4/16/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 5, 2020 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE filed by County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 8/5/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. For Zoom connection, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/This proceeding will be a Zoom video conferencing webinar. ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF PARTICIPATING COUNSEL IS REQUIRED and must be done by emailing a list of names and emails of counsel who will be participating in the hearing to JCSCRD@cand.uscourts.gov by no later than August 14, by 3 p.m. PDT. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III.Case participants may also receive an email invitation from the court with different information which should be followed.All counsel, members of the public and press please click the link or use the information below to join the webinar: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619260804?pwd=RE5qWDhGOTdWWTZUOFlOKzhNc3pjZz09Meeting ID: 161 926 0804Password: 050855Dial by your location+1 929 205 6099 US (New York)+1 253 215 8782 US+1 301 715 8592 US+1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago)+1 346 248 7799 US (Houston)+1 669 900 6833 US (San Jose)Find your local number: https://zoom.us/u/ac4JkPfcjoFor important information and guidance on technical preparation, please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco , Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.).(ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Settlement Conference is vacated and removed from Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse's 8/5/2020 calendar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order, signed 7/31/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #53 Stipulation for Dismissal of Matthias Williams and George Minaglia.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Matthias Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Settlement Conference on 8/5/2020: The settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse will take place via Zoom video conference in lieu of live appearances. The Court expects attorneys and clients to be available all day during the settlement conference and not to schedule other matters during that time. Attorneys and their clients may be in separate locations, but attorneys and clients must have computers with cameras and audio capability. The Court will provide information to allow attorneys and parties to join the conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference is set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alex Tse for Settlement. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/7/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 49 STIPULATION SELECTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES filed by George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Matthias Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/1/2020. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Mike Seville (by AT&T Conference Call). Defendant Attorney: Kara Abelson (by AT&T Conference Call). (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 47 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: CALL-IN INFORMATION FOR CMC HEARING AND CHANGING TIME: The case management conference set for 5/1/2020 at 2:00 PM, has been advanced to 1:30 PM. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone: Dial In: 888-684-8852. Access code: 8256171# Please bear in mind that the Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 46 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Matthias Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Matthias Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, signed 3/18/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #42 Stipulation to Dismiss Sheriff Mark Essick. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 43 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Essick.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Matthias Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING re #39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION filed by Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, George Minaglia, Brent Kidder, Robert Woodworth, Randy Williams, County of Sonoma. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/9/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 40 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against County of Sonoma, Robert Woodworth, Matthias Williams, George Minaglia, Mark Essick. Filed by Daniel Dudgeon. (Seville, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATED Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 3/9/2020) Modified on 3/10/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed b y Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, George Minaglia, Brent Kidder, Robert Woodworth, Randy Williams, County of Sonoma Correct event: Stipulated Protective Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/28/2020. Close of Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Designation of Experts due by 9/1/2020. Rebuttal Reports due by 9/15/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Deadline to file Dispositive Motions: Seven (7) week track with reply brief to be due four (4) weeks before the scheduled hearing date. Parties shall submit a stipulation with a briefing schedule. Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 11/20/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Michael Seville Attorney for Defendant: Kara Abelson (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 37 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Any party seeking a continuance shall e-file a stipulation and proposed order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part #23 Motion to Dismiss. (edllc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
January 28, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/28/2020) Modified on 1/28/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2020 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #23 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed by Daniel Dudgeon. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 1/21/2020) Modified on 1/21/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/17/2020. Plaintiff voluntarily dismissed Defendant City of Sonoma. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Michael Seville, Curtis Briggs, Vincent Barrientos Attorney for Defendant: Kara Abelson counsel for all Defendants except City of Sonoma(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Robert Woodworth.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randy Williams.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthias Williams.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kensell Williams.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by George Minaglia.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brent Kidder.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Officers and City of Sonoma shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/15/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE CORRECTING TIME.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Further Case Management Conference re-set for 1/17/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING re #19 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond filed by County of Sonoma. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/18/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by County of Sonoma.. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, filed by County of Sonoma. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/6/2019. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2020. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/17/2020 02:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Seville. Defendant Attorney: No Appearance. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on County of Sonoma on 12/3/2019, filed by Daniel Dudgeon. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant County of Sonoma shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/19/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Sonoma. (Abelson, Kara) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Document is blank [err201]. Please flatten document and re-file in its entirety. Re: #14 Affidavit of Service filed by Daniel Dudgeon. (wsnS, COUR T STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on County of Sonoma on 12/3/2019, filed by Daniel Dudgeon. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Dudgeon.. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 PLEASE DISREGARD. FORM IS INCOMPLETE. SEE ENTRY #12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Dudgeon.. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 10/25/2019) Modified on 10/28/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/28/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #10 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Jud ge filed by Daniel Dudgeon Document is blank. please complete the document and refile.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT INCOMPLETE. COUNSEL TO REFILE A COMPLETED DOCUMENT CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Dudgeon.. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/4/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Brent Kidder, George Minaglia, County of Sonoma, Kensell Williams, Matthias Williams, Randy Williams, Robert Woodworth. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Sonoma. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2019 02:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/9/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Daniel Dudgeon Can not issue summons more than once on a defendant Party (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/20/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF TITLE 42 USC 1983, VIOLATION OF CAL.CIVILCODE 52.1, VIOLATION OF COMMON LAW TORTS, VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA TORT CLAIMS ACT, AND DAMAGES; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13680055.). Filed byDaniel Dudgeon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barrientos, Vincent) (Filed on 9/5/2019) Modified on 9/9/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudgeon v. Sonoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthias Williams
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Kidder
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Woodworth
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Represented By: Michael Alcock King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kensell Williams
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Williams
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Minaglia
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Essick
Represented By: Kara Ann Abelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Dudgeon
Represented By: Vincent L Barrientos
Represented By: Michael Ryan Seville
Represented By: Curtis L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?