Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. BioCardia, Inc.
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation and Fortis Advisors LLC
Defendant: BioCardia, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Surbhi Sarna
Case Number: 3:2019cv05645
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to Surbhi Sarna. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Summons. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by BioCardia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against BioCardia, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Fortis Advisors LLC, Surbhi Sarna byBioCardia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Thirty (30) days filed by BioCardia, Inc.. (Feinberg, Ian) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Fortis Advisors LLC, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. BioCardia, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Chan, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 19 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/11/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed Clerk on 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Fortis Advisors LLC.. (Chan, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Savageau). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Wagner). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Grimsrud). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Barta). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrea Savageau ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13698479.) filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Savageau, Andrea) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin Wagner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26K56F3H.) Filing fee previously paid on 09-12-2019 filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wagner, Kevin) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Timothy Grimsrud ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13698354.) filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Grimsrud, Timothy) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13698208.) filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barta, Lauren) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to BioCardia, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/23/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Fortis Advisors LLC identifying Other Affiliate Amy Garcia, Other Affiliate David Snow, Other Affiliate Kevin O'Connor, Other Affiliate Catalyst Health Ventures, Other Affiliate Alan Bradley, Other Affiliate Albert K. Chin, Other Affiliate Andrew Brill, Other Affiliate Andrew Cleeland, Other Affiliate Anula Jayasuriya, Other Affiliate Arboretum Ventures IV, LP, Other Affiliate Astia Angel nVision LLC, Other Affiliate Christina Skieller, Other Affiliate CHV Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Cindy Domecus, Other Affiliate Connie Milburn, Other Affiliate Donna Jean Butcher, Other Affiliate Elena Gates, Other Affiliate Draper Associates Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Draper Associates Riskmaster Fund LLC, Other Affiliate Drexler Family Trust, Other Affiliate Ed Tacdol, Other Affiliate Excelestar Ventures I, LLC, Other Affiliate eXXclaim Capital Partners I, LP, Other Affiliate Fogarty Institute for Innovation, Other Affiliate Golden Seeds nVision Medical, LLC, Other Affiliate Jacob Schwarz, Other Affiliate Jesus Magana, Other Affiliate John Mittelstet, Other Affiliate Life Sciences Angel Investors VIII, LLC, Other Affiliate Lisa Golden, Other Affiliate LMNVC, LLC, Other Affiliate Mike Nishimura, Other Affiliate Peggy McLaughlin, Other Affiliate Ric Cote, Other Affiliate Seraph nVision LLC, Other Affiliate Serge Bierhuizen, Other Affiliate St Goar/Cassani T/A DTD 9/12/2001, Other Affiliate Surbhi Sarna, Other Affiliate Vaishali Suraj, Other Affiliate Viviane Connor, Other Affiliate Vurnetha Bitoy, Other Affiliate Wendy Heigel, Other Affiliate Katherine Macway, Other Affiliate Jose Garza for Fortis Advisors LLC. (Gross, David) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Complaint and Supporting Exhibit filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc., Fortis Advisors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Gross, David) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Gross, David) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory judgments and other relief against BioCardia, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13683881.). Filed byBoston Scientific Corporation, Fortis Advisors LLC, Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, David) (Filed on 9/6/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boston Scientific Corporation et al v. BioCardia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioCardia, Inc.
Represented By: Ian Neville Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific SciMed, Inc.
Represented By: David John Francis Gross
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Wagner
Represented By: Timothy E. Grimsrud
Represented By: Andrea Ileana Savageau
Represented By: Nicholas Poli Chan
Represented By: Lauren J.F. Barta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: David John Francis Gross
Represented By: Timothy E. Grimsrud
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Wagner
Represented By: Nicholas Poli Chan
Represented By: Lauren J.F. Barta
Represented By: Andrea Ileana Savageau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fortis Advisors LLC
Represented By: David John Francis Gross
Represented By: Nicholas Poli Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Surbhi Sarna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?