Tarakanov et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mark Tarakanov and Nelya Tarakanov
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv05666
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss.In light of the notice of intent to file an amended complaint as of right under Rule 15(a)(1)(B), the court terminates the pending motion to dismiss as (essentially) moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Mark Tarakanov, Nelya Tarakanov re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Notice of Intent to File First Amended Complaint (Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lexington Insurance Company.. (Wagoner, James) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Lexington Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 11/1/2019. Replies due by 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagoner, James) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Mark Tarakanov. (Frost, John) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Tarakanov, Nelya Tarakanov. Lexington Insurance Company served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mark Tarakanov, Nelya Tarakanov.. (Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lexington Insurance Company. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lexington Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13686212.). Filed byMark Tarakanov, Nelya Tarakanov. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Llewellyn, Paul) (Filed on 9/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarakanov et al v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tarakanov
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelya Tarakanov
Represented By: Paul Timothy Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?