Varian Medical Systems, Inc. v. ViewRay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Varian Medical Systems, Inc.
Defendant: ViewRay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05697
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Greco (Greco, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13847103.) filed by ViewRay, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rusnak, Eric) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo (Lo, Audrey) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 Certificate of Interested Entities by ViewRay, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Daniel Moore, Other Affiliate James Dempsey, Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited, Other Affiliate All shareholders of ViewRay, Inc., Other Affiliate Board of Directors of ViewRay, Inc., Other Affiliate Scott Drake, Other Affiliate Caley Castelein, Other Affiliate Scott Huennekens, Other Affiliate D Keith Grossman, Other Affiliate Brian K Roberts, Other Affiliate Gail Wilensky, Other Affiliate Kevin Xie for ViewRay, Inc.. (Acharya, Ranjini) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViewRay, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Fosun International Limited for ViewRay, Inc.. (Acharya, Ranjini) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ViewRay, Inc.. (Acharya, Ranjini) (Filed on 11/1/2019) Modified on 11/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Luis Martinez Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Martinez, Jose) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Franco Emilio Muzzio Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Muzzio, Franco) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Srinivasan Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Srinivasan, Anjali) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Justina Kahn Sessions Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Sessions, Justina) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan K.M. Wong Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Leo L. Lam Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP (Lam, Leo) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. re #22 Clerk's Notice, (Ponder, Christopher) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 SI Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ViewRay, Inc... (Acharya, Ranjini) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Varian Medical Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/2/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant ViewRay shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/16/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Varian Medical Systems, Inc.. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/1/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Varian Medical Systems, Inc.. ViewRay, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Varian Medical Systems, Inc... (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/11/19. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to ViewRay, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patents (cc: form mailed to register). (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Scott Ponder (Ponder, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Liang (Liang, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Varian Medical Systems, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate R. Andrew Eckert, Timothy E. Guertin, Anat Ashkenazi, Jeffrey R. Balser, Judy Brunder, Jean-Luc Butel, Regina E. Dugan, Phil Febbo, David J. Illingworth, and Dow R. Wilson, Other Affiliate All shareholders of publicly held Varian Medical Systems, Inc. for Varian Medical Systems, Inc.. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ViewRay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13690369.). Filed byVarian Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batts, Harper) (Filed on 9/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Varian Medical Systems, Inc. v. ViewRay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViewRay, Inc.
Represented By: Eric C. Rusnak
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Represented By: Audrey Hsio-Chun Lo
Represented By: Ranjini Acharya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varian Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Liang
Represented By: Christopher Scott Ponder
Represented By: Harper Siems Batts
Represented By: Franco Emilio Muzzio
Represented By: Leo L. Lam
Represented By: Jose Luis Martinez
Represented By: Justina Kahn Sessions
Represented By: Ryan K.M. Wong
Represented By: Joseph A. Greco
Represented By: Anjali Srinivasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?