Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Defendant: Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05714
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Axis Surplus Insurance Company (Hsieh, Nelson) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Nelson S. Hsieh . (Hsieh, Nelson) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Letter from Nelson Hsieh . (Hsieh, Nelson) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent Sony Corporation of America for Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (DeNatale, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance As Counsel of Record for Defendant Sony Interactive Entertainment, LLC by Richard DeNatale. (DeNatale, Richard) (Filed on 10/24/2019) Modified on 10/25/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Axis Surplus Insurance Company re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #12 Waiver of Service Executed, #11 Request for Waiver of Service, 8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,, #10 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #9 Order Reassigning Case,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #1 Complaint (Makin, John) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Service waived by Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Makin, John) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC on 09/18/19 by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 10/18/2019. (Makin, John) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Axis Surplus Insurance Company.. (Hsieh, Nelson) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Makin, John) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Axis Surplus Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Axis Capital Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent AXIS Specialty U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent AXIS Specialty Global Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Axis Insurance Company for Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Seeds, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13694779.). Filed byAxis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsieh, Nelson) (Filed on 9/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Nelson Hsieh
Represented By: John Phillip Makin
Represented By: Robert Glenn Seeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?