Hall et al v. City of Walnut Creek et al
Plaintiff: Scott Hall and Taun Hall
Defendant: City of Walnut Creek, Tammy Keagy, Matt Smith, Holly Conners, DOES 1-25, inclusive., Tom Chaplin, Melissa Murphy and KC Hsiao
Case Number: 3:2019cv05716
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND WRONGFUL DEATH. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Tom Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Holly Conners, DOES 1-25, inclusive., KC Hsiao, Tammy Keagy, Melissa Murphy, Matt Smith. Filed byScott Hall, Taun Hall. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Hall, Taun Hall.. (Burris, John) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tom Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Holly Conners, KC Hsiao, Tammy Keagy, Melissa Murphy, Matt Smith. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/26/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nisenbaum, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND WRONGFUL DEATH. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Tom Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Holly Conners, DOES 1-25, inclusive., KC Hsiao, Tammy Keagy, Melissa Murphy, Matt Smith ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13695258.). Filed byScott Hall, Taun Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burris, John) (Filed on 9/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall et al v. City of Walnut Creek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Walnut Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Keagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Conners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Chaplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hall
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taun Hall
Represented By: Benjamin Nisenbaum
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?