Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC v. Loanvest IX, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC
Defendant: South Bay Real Estate Commerce Group, LLC, George Cresson and Loanvest IX, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05749
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Revised Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/18/2019. Replies due by 11/25/2019. (Dollar, Rachel) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Amended Notice of Hearing filed by Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 11/18/2019. Replies due by 11/25/2019. (Dollar, Rachel) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings re #5 Intra-District Transfer Order. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Intradistrict Transfer Order #3 . Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/25/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw Reference NOTICE OF HEARING filed by Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dollar, Rachel) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to assign case to San Francisco or Oakland pursuant to Civ. L.R. 3.2.Transfer Case for Intradistrict Venue Transfer filed by Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/24/2019. Replies due by 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Dollar, Rachel) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/15/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court Bankruptcy Court case number 10-73976 MEH. Adversary Proceeding No. 17-4018 CN. Filed by Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Motion, #2 docket sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC v. Loanvest IX, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Bay Real Estate Commerce Group, LLC
Represented By: Mark Anthony Rushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Cresson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loanvest IX, L.P.
Represented By: Mark Anthony Rushin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kensington Apartment Properties, LLC
Represented By: Rachel M. Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?