Karnazes v. American Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Karnazes
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05754
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #19 Stipulation and Order,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley Ann Carpenter Bridwell WITH PROOF OF SERVICE (Carpenter Bridwell, Shirley) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines, Inc. re: Judge Orrick's Standing Orders (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by American Airlines, Inc. OF WITHDRAWAL OF ADAM C. HACKETT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 10/14/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 STIPULATION CONTINUING DATE OF HEARING AND RELATED FILINGS as to #13 First MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 11/8/2019. Reply due by 11/15/2019. Motion Hearing reset for 12/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/09/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DATE OF HEARING AND RELATED FILINGS WITH PROOF OF SERVICE filed by American Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset Motion Hearing as to #13 First MOTION to Dismiss for 11/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines, Inc. re #14 Request for Judicial Notice, #13 First MOTION to Dismiss , TO STRIKE OR FOR A MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE AMENDED (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/23/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice ; DECLARATION OF ADAM C. HACKETT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE filed byAmerican Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to Dismiss , TO STRIKE OR FOR A MORE DEFINITIVE STATEMENT AS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE filed by American Airlines, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/4/2019. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, to Strike or for a More Definitive Statement as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Airlines, Inc... (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines, Inc. re 6 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet by American Airlines, Inc. . (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Airlines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Airlines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by American Airlines, Inc. . (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-16-553781. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13702384). Filed byAmerican Airlines, Inc.. (Mangarpan, Tina) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However, incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 6/17). Please complete correct Civ il Cover Sheet of JS-CAND 44 (Rev 07/19) and re-file in its entirety as a separate docket entry Re: #2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by American Airlines, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karnazes v. American Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Tina Ivankovic Mangarpan
Represented By: Shirley Ann Carpenter Bridwell
Represented By: Adam Christian Hackett
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Karnazes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?