Singh et al v. IndyMac Bank, F.S.B. et al
Plaintiff: Tejindar P. Singh, Rajinder K. Singh and The Singh Family Properties, L.P.
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., DOES 1 TO 20, Affinia Default Services, LLC and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05758
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING: The Motion Hearing, which has been noticed for Thursday, November 14, 2019, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) filed byIndyMac Bank, F.S.B., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Affinia Default Services, LLC.. (Zuberi, Nabeel) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Affinia Default Services, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/4/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION BY DEFENDANT SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC AND INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed byRajinder K. Singh, Tejindar P. Singh, The Singh Family Properties, L.P.. (Lucas, Christopher) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rajinder K. Singh, Tejindar P. Singh, The Singh Family Properties, L.P... (Lucas, Christopher) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/15/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed byIndyMac Bank, F.S.B., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/21/2019. Replies due by 10/28/2019. (Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, of Service of Required Documents (Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IndyMac Bank, F.S.B., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC.. (Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/30/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing and Indymac Bank, F.S.B. from California Superior Court of Contra Costa County. Their case number is C19-01235. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13702926). Filed bySpecialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stoltzman, Michael) (Filed on 9/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. IndyMac Bank, F.S.B. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, F.S.B.
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Represented By: Michael W. Stoltzman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Represented By: Nabeel M. Zuberi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Stoltzman, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejindar P. Singh
Represented By: Christopher Robin Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajinder K. Singh
Represented By: Christopher Robin Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Singh Family Properties, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Robin Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?