Earth Island Institute et al v. Nash et al
Plaintiff: Greenpeace, Inc., James Hansen, Earth Island Institute and Sequoia Forestkeeper
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, California Department of Housing and Community Development, Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, U.S. Forest Service, Janice Waddell, United States Forest Service and United States Department of Housing & Urban Development
Case Number: 3:2019cv05792
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Transferring case electronically to the Eastern District of California. ***1:19-cv-01420*** (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying #26 Motion for TRO and Transferring Case to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 51 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for HCD Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by California Department of Housing and Community Development, Janice Waddell. (Yost, Awbrey) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #47 MOTION to Strike #42 Declaration in Support, #45 Declaration in Support, #40 Declaration in Support, #39 Declaration in Support, #41 Declaration in Support ) filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Hansen.. (Galpern, Daniel) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 48 OBJECTIONS to re #42 Declaration in Support, #45 Declaration in Support, #40 Declaration in Support, #39 Declaration in Support, #41 Declaration in Support, by California Department of Housing and Community Development. (Gosling, Kimberly) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
October 2, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #42 Declaration in Support, #45 Declaration in Support, #40 Declaration in Support, #39 Declaration in Support, #41 Declaration in Support filed by Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, United States Forest Service. Responses due by 10/16/2019. Replies due by 10/23/2019. (Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 JOINDER in #26 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by James Hansen (Galpern, Daniel) (Filed on 10/2/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 45 CORRECTED Declaration of Dr. Chad Hanson in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (CORRECTED with Exhibit 8) filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or, alternatively MOTION to Transfer Case, #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 43 SECOND Declaration of Meriel L. Darzen in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 42 SECOND Declaration of Chad Hanson in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 41 Second Declaration of May Kholsa in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019) Modified on 10/1/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Filing 40 Declaration of Ralph O. Bloemers in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ralph Bloemers)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Tonja Chi in Support of #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Second Decl of Tonja Chi, #2 Exhibit B to Second Decl of Tonja Chi)(Related document(s) #26 ) (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper re #9 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service on Defendant Waddell (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper re #9 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service on Defendant HCD (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byCalifornia Department of Housing and Community Development. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Susan Hale in Support of HCD's Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction)(Gosling, Kimberly) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 27, 2019 Filing 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction ) filed byJason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, United States Forest Service. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Benech Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2014 NEPA ROD, #3 Exhibit HCD Funding Approval, #4 Exhibit CWRP Status Report, #5 Exhibit HCD Response to Qs, #6 Exhibit Action Plan)(Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 31 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, United States Forest Service.. (Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, United States Forest Service re #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence between USDA and Earth Island Institute)(Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Order re #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Meriel L. Darzen in Support of #27 Brief, #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #27 , #26 ) (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 27 Brief re #26 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/24/2019) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration of Chad Hanson filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Chad Hanson, #11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Chad Hanson)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration of Amy Moas filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Amy Moas)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration of Pushker A. Karecha filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha, #14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Pushker Karecha)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Ara Marderosian filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ara Marderosian)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Daniel Brindis filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Tonja Chi filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Declaration of Tonja Chi)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Maya Kholsa filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Maya Kholsa)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Howard "Trip" Jennings filed byEarth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Howard "Trip" Jennings)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper.. (Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or, alternatively, MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, United States Forest Service. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 10/7/2019. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel M. Galpern representing Plaintiff James E. Hansen. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler McVeigh Alexander (Alexander, Tyler) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13718330.) filed by James Hansen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Cert of Good Standing)(Galpern, Daniel) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/3/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Joseph Weisman (Weisman, Dustin) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendants California Department of Housing and Community Development, Janice Waddell, Jason Kuiken, Kimberly Nash, United States Department of Housing & Urban Development, and United States Forest Service. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ralph O. Bloemers representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Meriel L. Darzen representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13709947) filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Oregon)(Bloemers, Ralph) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13709602) filed by Earth Island Institute, Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Darzen, Meriel) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons (proposed), #2 Summons (proposed), #3 Summons (proposed), #4 Summons (proposed), #5 Summons (proposed))(Voss, Rene) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13709187). Filed by Greenpeace, Inc., Sequoia Forestkeeper, Earth Island Institute and James Hansen. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Voss, Rene) (Filed on 9/16/2019) Modified on 9/17/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earth Island Institute et al v. Nash et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Represented By: Meriel Lee Darzen
Represented By: Ralph O. Bloemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hansen
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Represented By: Meriel Lee Darzen
Represented By: Ralph O. Bloemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia Forestkeeper
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Represented By: Meriel Lee Darzen
Represented By: Ralph O. Bloemers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Housing and Community Development
Represented By: Kimberly Rhea Gosling
Represented By: Awbrey A Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kuiken
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Represented By: Dustin Joseph Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Nash
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Represented By: Dustin Joseph Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Waddell
Represented By: Awbrey A Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Represented By: Dustin Joseph Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Housing & Urban Development
Represented By: Tyler McVeigh Alexander
Represented By: Dustin Joseph Weisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?