Clark v. CDCR et al
Petitioner: Loureece Stone Clark
Respondent: CDCR and Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Case Number: 3:2019cv05799
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of California as case number 2:19-cv-02014. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Loureece Stone Clark. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loureece Stone Clark.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 20, 2019 Updated petitioner's address to include prison name (CSP-SAC) and post office box used for inmate mail (from street address, 300 Prison Road). (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/25/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus. Filed byLoureece Stone Clark. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2019. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2019: #1 Envelope) (fabS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Loureece Stone Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court of California County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?