Huang et al v. Amazom.Com Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv05853
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 11/12/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 10/24/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 *** Please Disregard. See Docket #6 *** Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2019 02:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019) Modified on 10/22/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Xiaohua Huang. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Amazon.com Inc. Filed byXiaohua Huang. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang et al v. Amazom.Com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?