BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. v. AtGames Holdings, Ltd.
Plaintiff: BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.
Defendant: ATGAMES HOLDINGS, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05898
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. byAtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Diane Bennett (Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/14/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Lee Declaration and Certain Supporting Declaration Exhibits in Support of AtGames' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application ) AtGames' Corrected Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For A Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Granted (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #23 ) filed byAtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lee, #2 Exhibit 1 to Lee Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Lee Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Lee Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Lee Declaration, #6 Declaration Zhang, #7 Exhibit A to Zhang Declaration, #8 Exhibit B to Zhang Declaration, #9 Exhibit C to Zhang Declaration, #10 Exhibit D to Zhang Declaration, #11 Exhibit E to Zhang Declaration, #12 Declaration Hsiung, #13 Exhibit 1 to Hsiung Declaration, #14 Exhibit 2 to Hsiung Declaration, #15 Exhibit 3 to Hsiung Declaration, #16 Exhibit 4 to Hsiung Declaration, #17 Exhibit 5 to Hsiung Declaration, #18 Exhibit 6 to Hsiung Declaration, #19 Exhibit 7 to Hsiung Declaration, #20 Exhibit 8 to Hsiung Declaration)(Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria re #27 Administrative Motion to exceed the page limit. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AtGames' Administrative Motion To Exceed The Page Limit In Its Opposition To [Dkt No. 14] Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For A Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Sh ) filed byBANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Weikert, #2 Exhibit A to Weikert Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by AtGames Holdings, Ltd. CORRECTION OF DOCKET #26 AtGames' Certificate of Interested Entities (Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 #Electronic filing error re: #26 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by AtGames Holdings, Ltd. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION AtGames' Administrative Motion To Exceed The Page Limit In Its Opposition To [Dkt No. 14] Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For A Temporary Restraining Order And Order To Show Cause Why A Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Granted filed by AtGames Holdings, Ltd.. Responses due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Admin Motion, #2 Declaration Bennett, #3 Exhibit 1 to Bennett Decl., #4 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by AtGames Holdings, Ltd. (Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 5, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY (re #22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AtGames' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Lee Declaration and Certain Supporting Declaration Exhibits in Support of AtGames' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application ) Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum In Support of Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Granted filed byBANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Weikert, #2 Exhibit A to Weikert Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Weikert Declaration, #4 Declaration of David Murov, #5 Exhibit A to Murov Declaration, #6 Declaration of Patrick Lundell)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AtGames' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Lee Declaration and Certain Supporting Declaration Exhibits in Support of AtGames' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application ) filed byBANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/14/2019 10:00 AM. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 ***STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD PER COURT ORDER*** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Lee Declaration and Certain Supporting Declaration Exhibits in Support of AtGames' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application ) AtGames Holdings Ltd.'s Opposition to [Dkt No. 14] Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Granted filed by AtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Lee, #2 Exhibit 1 to Lee, #3 Exhibit 2 to Lee, #4 Exhibit 3 to Lee, #5 Exhibit 4 to Lee, #6 Declaration Zhang, #7 Exhibit A to Zhang, #8 Exhibit B to Zhang, #9 Exhibit C to Zhang, #10 Exhibit D to Zhang, #11 Exhibit E to Zhang, #12 Declaration Hsiung, #13 Exhibit 1 to Hsiung, #14 Exhibit 2 to Hsiung, #15 Exhibit 3 to Hsiung, #16 Exhibit 4 to Hsiung, #17 Exhibit 5 to Hsiung, #18 Exhibit 6 to Hsiung, #19 Exhibit 7 to Hsiung, #20 Exhibit 8 to Hsiung)(Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/31/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (knm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Lee Declaration and Certain Supporting Declaration Exhibits in Support of AtGames' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application filed by AtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bennett, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Lee, #4 Exhibit 1 to Lee, #5 Exhibit 2 to Lee, #6 Exhibit 3 to Lee, #7 Exhibit A to Zhang, #8 Exhibit B to Zhang, #9 Exhibit C to Zhang, #10 Exhibit D to Zhang, #11 Exhibit E to Zhang, #12 Exhibit 1 to Hsiung, #13 Exhibit 2 to Hsiung, #14 Exhibit 3 to Hsiung, #15 Exhibit 4 to Hsiung, #16 Exhibit 6 to Hsiung, #17 Exhibit 7 to Hsiung, #18 Exhibit 8 to Hsiung)(Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/31/2019) Modified on 11/7/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION Extending Time To Respond To Plaintiff Bandai Namco Entertainment America Inc.'s Complaint filed by AtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (Bennett, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Psihoules.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13825447.) filed by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Psihoules, Jennette) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - May.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13813468.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/22/19 filed by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(May, David) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. Notice of Entry of Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #14 Ex Parte Application for a temporary restraining order. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Granted filed by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Robert A. Weikert, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Declaration of Patrick Lundell, #12 Exhibit A, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D, #16 Exhibit E, #17 Exhibit F, #18 Exhibit G, #19 Exhibit H, #20 Exhibit I, #21 Exhibit J, #22 Exhibit K, #23 Exhibit L, #24 Declaration of Hideaki Irie, #25 Exhibit A, #26 Declaration of Melani Windham, #27 Exhibit A, #28 Declaration of Shuhei Hokari, #29 Exhibit A, #30 Declaration of Tony Peake, #31 Exhibit A, #32 Exhibit B, #33 Exhibit C, #34 Exhibit D, #35 Declaration of David L. May, #36 Exhibit A, #37 Exhibit B, #38 Exhibit C, #39 Declaration of Jennette W. Psihoules, #40 Exhibit A, #41 Exhibit B, #42 Exhibit C, #43 Exhibit D, #44 Exhibit E, #45 Proposed Order)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. re 10 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,, 12 Clerk's Notice,, #9 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #8 Patent/Trademark Report, #11 Order,,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc... (Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to AtGames Holdings, Ltd.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BANDAI NAMCO Holdings USA Inc. for BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BANDAI NAMCO Holdings USA Inc. for BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AtGames Holdings, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13724795.). Filed by BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weikert, Robert) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/25/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc. v. AtGames Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATGAMES HOLDINGS, LTD.
Represented By: Jennifer Diane Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANDAI NAMCO Entertainment America Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ahlefeld Weikert
Represented By: David L. May
Represented By: Jennette W. Psihoules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?