Troutman et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Paul Troutman and Brenda Troutman
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06093
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Pennsylvania Middle, 19-1238, Troutman et al. v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 19-6093 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 153 cc: JPMDL (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2019)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-01238. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to northern district of California Signed by John W. Nichols on 09/25/19. (mfa)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Paul Troutman, Brenda Troutman. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Lutz, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (pjr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4819203), filed by Paul Troutman, Brenda Troutman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troutman et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Troutman
Represented By: Jordan Amanda Marzzacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Troutman
Represented By: Jordan Amanda Marzzacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?