Morris v. Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center
Plaintiff: Deandre Morris
Defendant: Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv06394
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 01:30 PM has been rescheduled to 1/15/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. The Joint Case Management Statement is due no later than 1/8/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center and Deandre Morris. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 11/13/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center.. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/7/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Deandre Morris.. (Beletsis, Daphne) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center and Deandre Morris. (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/9/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center . (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 07/16 used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19 re : #1 . #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 8, 2019 *** Electronic Notice sent in error. Please Disregard. *** . Case has been randomly assigned to judge. However the filing fee is due. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center re #1 Notice of Removal, (Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from Sonoma County Superior Court of CA. Their case number is SCV-264971. (Fee Waived) . Filed byMedicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Johann, Pamela) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/8/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicare Benefits Coordination and Records Center
Represented By: Pamela T. Johann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?