Bryant et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Judy Bryant and Roger Bryant
Defendant: Monsanto Management Club-Nitro Plant, Monsanto Company, Does 1-50 and Flexsys America Limited
Case Number: 3:2019cv06395
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741 VC; Southern District of West Virginia (Huntington), 3:19-cv-00602, Bryant v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-06395 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 155 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00602. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of California transferring this action to the USDC/NDCA for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/4/2019. (cc: attys) (kew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-155), MDL 2741. (kew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Monsanto Company in opposition to #6 MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Boone, Floyd) (Modified on 10/3/2019 to correct party filer)(ts).
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION REGARDING IMPROPER SERVICE ON MONSANTO MANAGEMENT CLUB - NITRO PLANT by Monsanto Company (Attachment: #1 Declaration of Otto J. Drescher)(Boone, Floyd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant in support of #6 MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Elswick-Hall, Kelly)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Judy Bryant, Roger Bryant to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Mason County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Elswick-Hall, Kelly)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Flexsys America Limited.(Boone, Floyd)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company.(Boone, Floyd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Monsanto Company (Boone, Floyd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (jsa)
August 19, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Monsanto Company with summons, complaint, declaration of David A. Woodmansee, declaration of Otto J. Drescher, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Mason County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7355833. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Management Club-Nitro Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Floyd E. Boone, Jr.
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Represented By: Charles M. Love, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flexsys America Limited
Represented By: Floyd E. Boone, Jr.
Represented By: William Montgomery Lorensen
Represented By: Charles M. Love, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bryant
Represented By: Kelly Elswick-Hall
Represented By: Aimee H Wagstaff
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Bryant
Represented By: Kelly Elswick-Hall
Represented By: Aimee H Wagstaff
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?