Gordon v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Garfield Gordon
Defendant: Bayer Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06423
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-05200. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-155) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2741. (MAP)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Bayer Corporation. (Fischer, Ian)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 *ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bayer Corporation.(Fischer, Ian) *Modified to clarify text on 9/26/2019 (RMV).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 *ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Monsanto Company.(Fischer, Ian) *Modified to add document linkage on 9/26/2019 (RMV).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/19/2019. (MMO)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17413494. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5200-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
September 18, 2019 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Monsanto Company, Bayer Corporation on 8/29/2019. (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/4/2019) (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company. (Fischer, Ian) (ARC)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2019-054080. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17413494 filed by Monsanto Company.(Fischer, Ian) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garfield Gordon
Represented By: Michael Craig McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Joshua Grabel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?