Schaible v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Mark G. Schaible
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv06434
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00633. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2741 (laf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/17/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/3/2019. (WRW)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/3/2019. (WRW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (drn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Mark G. Schaible. (Williamson, George)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/3/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (drn)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/3/2019. (drn)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-633-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15870565) filed by Mark G. Schaible. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Williamson, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaible v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark G. Schaible
Represented By: George T. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?