Diggs v. California Department of State Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Michael La Roy Diggs
Defendant: California Department of State Hospital, Patricia Tyler, Stephanie Clenindimd, Amy Davis, Sterling Price, Cindy Black and Napa State Hospital
Case Number: 3:2019cv06517
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CET
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
2 Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
3 Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 8 Letter dated 11/25/19 from Michael LaRoy Diggs requesting appointment of counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 Letter dated 11/25/19 from Michael LaRoy Diggs requesting an additional plaintiff to be added to this action. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael La Roy Diggs (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael La Roy Diggs. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1983) (no process) against Cindy Black, California Department of State Hospital, Stephanie Clenindimd, Amy Davis, Napa State Hospital, Sterling Price, Patricia Tyler, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 10/10/2019). Filed by Michael La Roy Diggs. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. California Department of State Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Clenindimd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael La Roy Diggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?