Lentz et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz and MaryBeth Norman
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv06570
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Glick, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 23 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Glick, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael A. Glick. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gregg F. LoCascio. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13894361) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Glick, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13894334) filed by Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(LoCascio, Gregg) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Edward McKane (McKane, Mark) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by MaryBeth Norman, Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz. Service waived by Sanderson Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 10/21/2019, answer due 12/20/2019. (Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Marie Bernal on behalf of Bonner Walsh (Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Marie Bernal on behalf of Gretchen Elsner (Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gretchen Elsner. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gretchen Elsner, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13847678) filed by Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz, MaryBeth Norman. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bonner Walsh. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Bonner Walsh, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13837851) filed by Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz, MaryBeth Norman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Bar Numbers), #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Idaho, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - Oregon, #4 Certificate of Good Standing - Texas, #5 Certificate of Good Standing - Washington)(Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz, MaryBeth Norman.. (Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sanderson Farms, Inc.. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sanderson Farms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13788767.). Filed byMaryBeth Norman, Pam La Fosse, Daniel Lentz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bernal, Alison) (Filed on 10/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lentz et al v. Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam La Fosse
Represented By: Alison Marie Bernal
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Jonathan Dengler Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lentz
Represented By: Alison Marie Bernal
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Jonathan Dengler Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaryBeth Norman
Represented By: Alison Marie Bernal
Represented By: Gretchen Elsner
Represented By: Bonner Charles Walsh
Represented By: Jonathan Dengler Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Gregg LoCascio
Represented By: Michael Adam Glick
Represented By: Mark Edward McKane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?