Sigg v. Lost Coast Collective Inc et al
Plaintiff: Henry Sigg
Defendant: Lost Coast Collective Inc, Lauren Tatton and Enoch Tatton
Case Number: 3:2019cv06608
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Case dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Henry Sigg (Kluck, Laurence) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.

October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2020 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Lost Coast Collective Inc Re: Notice of Removal. (Nick, J.) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Notice of Remov al, filed by Lost Coast Collective Inc (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lost Coast Collective Inc.. (Nick, J.) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court State of California Humboldt County. Their case number is DR190683. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13794004). Filed byLost Coast Collective Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state summons & complaint)(Nick, J.) (Filed on 10/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sigg v. Lost Coast Collective Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lost Coast Collective Inc
Represented By: J. David Nick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Tatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enoch Tatton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Sigg
Represented By: Laurence Allan Kluck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?