Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. Pena et al
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin Robbins and Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Defendant: Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc., Michael Pena, Jennifer Pena and Michael O. Pena
Case Number: 3:2019cv06657
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to all Defendants. (Related documents(s) #13 )(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #13 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Defendants Palo Alto Sandw iches, Inc., Michael O. Pena, and Jennifer Pena filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, BR IP Holder LLC The Correct E-Filing Event is Motion to Enter Default not Motion to Enter Default Judgment. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by the Clerk as to Defendants Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc., Michael O. Pena, and Jennifer Pena filed by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 11/25/2019) Modified on 11/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC.. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/20/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 4, 2019 #Electronic filing error Re: #8 , #9 , #10 Certificate of Service filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC, BR IP Holder LLC. Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk 's Office. No further action is necessary. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Jennifer Pena served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Michael O. Pena served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC for BR IP Holder LLC, Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc., Jennifer Pena, Michael O. Pena. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief against Michael O. Pena, Jennifer Pena, Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13799694). Filed by Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC , BR IP Holder LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chang, Jaemin) (Filed on 10/16/2019) Modified on 10/17/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC et al v. Pena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palo Alto Sandwiches, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael O. Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BR IP Holder LLC
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin Robbins
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baskin-Robbins Franchising LLC
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?