Singh v. American Postal Workers Union Oakland Local 78 et al
Plaintiff: Preet M. Singh
Defendant: Janet D. Morris, Frank J. Grimsley, Yolanda Byrd, Dainon L. McCullough, Maria E. Soto, American Postal Workers Union Oakland Local 78, John Norman, United States of America, Geraldine Manzo and Jagmohan Singh
Case Number: 3:2019cv06659
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Assistant United States Attorney's Reply Dated 11/19/19 by Preet M. Singh (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING DOCKET NUMBER ON FILINGS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/19/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/19/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint ) Federal Defendants' Reply filed byYolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION filed byPreet M. Singh. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Amended Motion by Preet M. Singh (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Preet M. Singh.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (Amended Notice of Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASES 17-cv-02211-VC, Singh v. United States Postal Service; and 19-cv-06659-JCS, Singh v. American Postal Workers Union Oakland Local 78 et al. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 10/28/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 10/28/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, #7 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #6 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 11/4/2019. Replies due by 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James A. Scharf)(Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Relate Cases filed by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America. Responses due by 10/25/2019. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America.. (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America re #2 Notice (Other), #1 Notice of Removal, (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Yolanda Byrd, Frank J. Grimsley, Geraldine Manzo, Dainon L. McCullough, Janet D. Morris, John Norman, Jagmohan Singh, Maria E. Soto, United States of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Certification Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2679(d) (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG15786807. (Filing Fee Waived). Filed by Janet D. Morris, Frank J. Grimsley, John Norman, Maria E. Soto, Yolanda Byrd, Jagmohan Singh, Geraldine Manzo, United States of America, Dainon L. McCullough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Scharf, James) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. American Postal Workers Union Oakland Local 78 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet D. Morris
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Grimsley
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolanda Byrd
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dainon L. McCullough
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria E. Soto
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Postal Workers Union Oakland Local 78
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Norman
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine Manzo
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jagmohan Singh
Represented By: James A. Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preet M. Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?