Bickham v. Maersk Line, Limited et al
Plaintiff: Omoro Bickham
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited and Maersk Line A/S
Case Number: 3:2019cv06743
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Omoro Bickham.. (Marks, Lia) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maersk Line A/S, Maersk Line, Limited.. (Tamulski, James) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/1/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maersk Line A/S, Maersk Line, Limited re #1 Notice of Removal, (Tamulski, James) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action Under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1441(b) Diversity from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG19035560. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13807144). Filed byMaersk Line, Limited, Maersk Line A/S. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tamulski, James) (Filed on 10/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickham v. Maersk Line, Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line, Limited
Represented By: James Joseph Tamulski
Represented By: Andrew Ira Port
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maersk Line A/S
Represented By: James Joseph Tamulski
Represented By: Andrew Ira Port
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omoro Bickham
Represented By: Lyle C. Cavin, Jr.
Represented By: Lia Trelease Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?