Collins v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jennifer Collins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv06873
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/15/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 SSA Administrative Transcript Notice of Lodging Transcript of the Admninistrative Record in Paper and Electronic Form by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Part 1, #2 Part 2, #3 Part 3, #4 Part 4, #5 Part 5, #6 Part 6, #7 Part 7, #8 Part 8, #9 Part 9, #10 Part 10, #11 Part 11, #12 Part 12, #13 Part 13, #14 Part 14)(Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) bySocial Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Security Administration.. (Snyder, Patrick) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Social Security Administration re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Proof of Service (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Social Security Administration re #1 Notice of Removal, (Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Contra Costa Superior Court, Small Claims - Richmond. Their case number is RSC 19-0440. (). Filed bySocial Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garbers, Wendy) (Filed on 10/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Wendy M. Garbers
Represented By: Sara Winslow
Represented By: Patrick William Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?