D.R. et al v. Contra Costa County CA et al
Plaintiff: Cristina Ramirez, D. R. and John Freeman
Defendant: Marcie Franich, Mizel Tasha, Contra Costa County CA and Tasha Mizel
Case Number: 3:2019cv07152
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Freeman, D. R., Cristina Ramirez.. (Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Contra Costa County CA, Marcie Franich, Tasha Mizel. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #12 Administrative Motion for Leave to Serve the Summons and Complaint. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Permission to Serve Defendants filed by John Freeman, D. R., Cristina Ramirez. Responses due by 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER dated 11/8/19 from Quoc T Pham providing defendants addresses. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #5 Administrative Motion to Seal the Complaint Docketed as Document Number 1. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE requesting defendants addresses for service. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/13/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by John Freeman, D. R., Cristina Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Freeman. (Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by John Freeman, D. R., Cristina Ramirez . (Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH CORRECTION against Contra Costa County CA, Marcie Franich, Mizel Tasha. Filed byD. R., Cristina Ramirez, John Freeman. (Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Civil Cover Sheet missing. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT: Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 ***Temporary seal, contains personal identifiers***COMPLAINT against Contra Costa County CA, Marcie Franich, Mizel Tasha. Filed by D. R., Cristina Ramirez, John Freeman. (Pham, Quoc) (Filed on 10/29/2019) Modified on 10/30/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.R. et al v. Contra Costa County CA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristina Ramirez
Represented By: Quoc Tuan Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. R.
Represented By: Quoc Tuan Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Freeman
Represented By: Quoc Tuan Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcie Franich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizel Tasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Mizel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?