Overton
Plaintiff: Michael L. Overton
Case Number: 3:2019cv07158
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: PSLC LLH
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/17/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on December 17, 2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 12/12/2019. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary release filed by Michael L. Overton. Responses due by 12/2/2019. Replies due by 12/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 face page of envelope)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/9/2019. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by Michael L. Overton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice 2, #3 Envelope 2)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?