Griffin v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Donna S Griffin
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07318
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: Eastern District of Arkansas, 3:19-cv-00263-DPM, Griffin v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 19-07318 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 157 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00263. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California on this date as part of MDL No. 2741 pursuant to #2 Conditional Transfer Order. (jak)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741 In Re: Roundup Products Liability Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 10/15/2019. (jak)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company, filed by Donna S Griffin. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT074032. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna S Griffin
Represented By: John K. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?