Malasto et al v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Monica Whitehead, Mia Malasto, Tyler Purvis and VIRGINIA RIVERA
Defendant: Pax Labs Inc, Altria Group Inc. and JUUL Labs Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv07334
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04226. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of California. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of California, IN RE: MDL 2913 on November 5, 2019. (MAC)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District for the Northern District of California IN RE: MDL 2913, JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER #6. (MAC)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY ON JURISDICTION - As the party asking this Court to invoke its jurisdiction, Plaintiffs must properly allege the citizenship of each of the parties to establish subject matter jurisdiction. Therefore, the Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement that establishes the Court's jurisdiction over this case. This statement should specifically identify the citizenship of Plaintiffs Virginia Rivera and Monica Whitehead. This jurisdictional statement is due fourteen (14) days from the date of this Entry. (See Entry.) Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/21/2019.(NAD)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JUUL LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC.. (AKH)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., filed by Monica Whitehead, Mia Malasto, Virginia Rivera, Tyler Purvis. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5677527) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Summons JUUL Labs Inc, #3 Civil Summons PAX Labs Inc, #4 Civil Summons Altria Group Inc)(Coleman, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malasto et al v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pax Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Whitehead
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Malasto
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Purvis
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA RIVERA
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?