Tucson Unified School District v. Juul Labs Incorporated
Plaintiff: Tucson Unified School District
Defendant: Juul Labs Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv07335
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 4:19-cv-00504. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 5, 2019 Remark: Case Transferred to the Northern District of California via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) Transferring Case to the Northern District of California Re MDL-2913. (MAP)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tucson Unified School District: Affidavit of Service re: Complaint upon Juul Labs on 10/22/2019. (Webb, Nathan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Juul Labs Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17537212. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer G Zipps. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-00504-TUC-JGZ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Tucson Unified School District. (Webb, Nathan) (BAC)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-17537212 filed by Tucson Unified School District. (Webb, Nathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson Unified School District v. Juul Labs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Unified School District
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Brad Honnold
Represented By: Jose de Jesus Rivera
Represented By: Joseph G VanZandt
Represented By: Jonathan P. Kieffer
Represented By: Tyler W. Hudson
Represented By: Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.
Represented By: Kirk J. Goza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?