McAllister v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Susan McAllister
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07338
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 7, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: District of Maryland, 1:19-cv-02229-CCB, McAllister v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 19-07338 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 153 cc: JPMDL. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 1:19-cv-02229. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nicolson 9/25/2019.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of California(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nicolson 9/25/2019(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Monsanto Company.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Susan McAllister re #1 Complaint Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Case (Miller, Jay)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8156441.), filed by Susan McAllister. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McAllister
Represented By: Jay Dante Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?