Wirtz v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Charles Wirtz
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07339
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Iowa (Central Division), 3:19-cv-03043 LRR KEM, Wirtz v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07339 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 163 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-03043. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-163) MDL No. 2741. This action is transferred to USDC Northern District of California and assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 11/4/2019. (Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California) (des)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (ksy)
September 3, 2019 Judge Linda R Reade and Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added.(No conflicts identified) (ksy)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3011273.), filed by Charles Wirtz. Scheduling Repoprt Deadline 12/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, James) Modified text on 9/3/2019 (ksy).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wirtz v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wirtz
Represented By: James H Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?