Gonzalez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jesus Maria Gonzalez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv07426
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Roth, Armand) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 Acknowledgement of Receipt by U.S. Marshal re #6 Summons Issued. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 18, 2019 Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshals Post Box in the Clerks Office mailroom. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall issue the summons. Furthermore, the U.S. Marshal for the Northern District of California shall serve, without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint, any amendments or attachments, Plaintiff's affidavit and this order upon Defendant(s).(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jesus Maria Gonzalez. (Holmes, Rachael) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:[ 1] or submit a forma pauperis application. Complaint filed by Jesus Maria Gonzalez (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed byJesus Maria Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holmes, Rachael) (Filed on 11/12/2019) Modified on 11/14/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Maria Gonzalez
Represented By: Rachael Louie Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?