Amazon.com, Inc. v. Sonohm Licensing LLC
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Defendant: SONOHM LICENSING LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv07474
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. re #19 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Wu, Min) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/13/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Amazon.com, Inc. DO NOT ENTER PARTIES IN ALL CAPITALIZED LETTERING (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Min Wu (Wu, Min) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath (Ranganath, Ravi) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Richard Gregorian (Gregorian, Todd) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Saina Sason Shamilov (Shamilov, Saina) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk J. Anderson (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Gregorian, Todd) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 11/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amazon.com, Inc... (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon.com, Inc. of Summons; Complaint; Blank Case Management Statement; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; etc. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to SONOHM LICENSING LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Amazon.com, Inc. . (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17 used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a s eparate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) re: #1 . #5 Complaint, filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc. and Certificate of Interested Parties (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against SONOHM LICENSING LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13886051.). Filed byAmazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hadden, J.) (Filed on 11/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. v. Sonohm Licensing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONOHM LICENSING LLC
Represented By: Kirk J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath
Represented By: Saina Sason Shamilov
Represented By: Todd Richard Gregorian
Represented By: Min Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?