Wood et al v. County of Contra Costa et al
Plaintiff: TP and Andrea Wood
Defendant: Cecelia Gutierrez, Erica Bains, Ravinder Bains, State of California, Kellie Case, Edyth Williams and County of Contra Costa
Case Number: 3:2019cv07597
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Maxine M Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains ) Reply Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Bains' Motion to Dismiss filed byErica Bains, Ravinder Bains. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David M. Helbraun in Support of Reply Re Bains' Motion to Dismiss)(Helbraun, David M.) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss, #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains. ***Set/Reset Hearing*** Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2020 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. No later than January 31, 2020, plaintiffs shall file their application for appointment of a guardian ad litem for TP. The hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss is continued to February 28, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 13, 2020, to April 24, 2020, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 13, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by David M. M. Helbraun (Helbraun, David M.) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains ) filed byTP, Andrea Wood. (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 7, 2020. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byKellie Case, County of Contra Costa, Cecelia Gutierrez, Edyth Williams. (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2020.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #20 MOTION to Dismiss ) of Kellie Case, County of Contra Costa, Cecelia Gutierrez, Edyth Williams, filed byTP, Andrea Wood. (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 26 Brief re #25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to FRCP(12)(b)(6) filed byErica Bains, Ravinder Bains. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Helbraun, David M.) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Erica Bains and Ravinder Bains filed by Erica Bains, Ravinder Bains. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 1/7/2020. Replies due by 1/14/2020. (Helbraun, David M.) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) filed by State of California. (Taylor, Samona) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samona Leigh Anne Taylor NOTICE OF APPEARNCE (Taylor, Samona) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed byKellie Case, County of Contra Costa, Cecelia Gutierrez, Edyth Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #20 ) (Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kellie Case, County of Contra Costa, Cecelia Gutierrez, Edyth Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 12/30/2019. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodriquez, Sean) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RELATED CASE ORDER. Wood v. County of Contra Costa, et al., C 19-4266 MMC, is related to Wood, et al. v. County of Contra Costa, et al., C 19-7597 JCS. The Clerk of Court shall reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2019. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on Ravinder Bains (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on Kellie Chase (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on Erica Bains (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on Edyth Williams (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on County of Contra Costa (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TP, Andrea Wood Summons on Cecelia Gutierrez (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service of Summons served on State of California on 12/02/2019, filed by TP, Andrea Wood. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on Cecelia Gutierrez, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on County of Contra Costa, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on Edyth Williams, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on Erica Bains, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on Kellie Case, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service of Summons on Ravinder Bains)(Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to State of California. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Ravinder Bains. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kellie Case. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Erica Bains. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Edyth Williams. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to County of Contra Costa. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cecelia Gutierrez. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Declaratory Relief; Jury Trial Demanded against Erica Bains, Ravinder Bains, Kellie Case, County of Contra Costa, Cecelia Gutierrez, State of California, Edyth Williams (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13903392.). Filed by Andrea Wood. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment) (Angelucci, Marc) (Filed on 11/19/2019) Modified on 11/19/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. County of Contra Costa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecelia Gutierrez
Represented By: Sean Michael Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Bains
Represented By: David M. M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravinder Bains
Represented By: David M. M. Helbraun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Samona Leigh Anne Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Case
Represented By: Sean Michael Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edyth Williams
Represented By: Sean Michael Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Contra Costa
Represented By: Sean Michael Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TP
Represented By: Marc Etienne Angelucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Wood
Represented By: Marc Etienne Angelucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?