Sharpe et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sharpe and Floyd Sharpe
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07611
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Eastern District of Missouri (St. Louis), 4:19-cv-02451 SPM, Sharpe v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07611 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 157 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02451. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (JWD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-157) regarding IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL No. 2741. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel.(JWD)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
August 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Seth S. Webb. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. (MFG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Floyd Sharpe, Kimberly Sharpe (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Webb, Seth)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company with receipt number AMOEDC-7427876, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Floyd Sharpe, Kimberly Sharpe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form)(Webb, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharpe et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sharpe
Represented By: Seth S. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Sharpe
Represented By: Seth S. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?