Rahimi et al v. Wolf et al
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf and John Kramar
Petitioner: Salumeh Mirzaeian and Hossein Rahimi
Case Number: 3:2019cv07633
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Salumeh Mirzaeian, Hossein Rahimi (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Salumeh Mirzaeian, Hossein Rahimi.. (Morales, Kelsey) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Salumeh Mirzaeian, Hossein Rahimi of re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, #6 Summons Issued, #5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, #2 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet (Morales, Kelsey) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hossein Rahimi, Salumeh Mirzaeian. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; John Kramar served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020; Chad Wolf served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Morales, Kelsey) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Respondents Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar & Chad Wolf. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER (Immigration Mandamus Case). (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Salumeh Mirzaeian, Hossein Rahimi - (Correct Rev. Date) (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to magistrate judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS44 (Rev. 06/17). Please complete and re -file as a separate docket entry Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19 re Complaint #1 . #2 filed by Salumeh Mirzaeian et al (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13907335). Filed byHossein Rahimi, Salumeh Mirzaeian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration with exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nightingale, Zachary) (Filed on 11/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahimi et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Salumeh Mirzaeian
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hossein Rahimi
Represented By: Zachary Miller Nightingale
Represented By: Kelsey Ann Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?