Intel Corporation et al v. Fortress Investment Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation and Apple Inc.
Defendant: VLSI Technology LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc 2017 LLC, IXI IP,LLC, Fortress Credit Co LLC, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., DSS Technology Management, Inc., SEVEN Networks, LLC, Inventergy Global, Inc., INVT SPE LLC and Fortress Investment Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv07651
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #75 Order on Stipulation filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by Erica J. Van Loon (Van Loon, Erica) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dean C. Eyler ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14081856.) filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Dean, Eyler) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Daniel R. Shulman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14081802.) filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Shulman, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 81 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation . Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L served by electronic mail on 1/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 1/15/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2019 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Inventergy Global, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Carlson, Steven) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Liv Leila Herriot on behalf of Intel Corporation and Apple Inc. (Herriot, Liv) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation re #33 Summons Returned Executed Notice Of Filing Of Corrected Proof Of Service On Inventergy Global, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #72 Stipulation. Answer due 2/4/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Schubert ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13976663.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Schubert, Kevin) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Carlson for Defendant Inventergy Global, Inc. (Carlson, Steven) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines to Respond to the Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule filed by Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, VLSI Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Matthew Ashley in Support of Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Ashley, Alvin) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel H. Lipanovich (Lipanovich, Nathaniel) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Patrick Holland (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for John Briody ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966155.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Briody, John) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Truelove ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966145.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Truelove, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Burgess ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966125.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Burgess, Kevin) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Eric P. Barstad ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966101.) filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Barstad, Eric) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Seth Hasenour ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966088.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hasenour, Seth) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13966051.) filed by Seven Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Baxter, Samuel) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seven Networks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF SVN LLC, Other Affiliate CF SVN Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Seven Stockholders Corp., Other Affiliate Ross Bott, Other Affiliate Ari Backholm, Other Affiliate Amadeus II, Inc., Other Affiliate Ken Sawyer, Other Affiliate Sawyer Family Trust, Other Affiliate David Quinlivan for Seven Networks, LLC. (Dillman, Kirk) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk Dillman (Dillman, Kirk) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William Reiss ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13960435.) filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Reiss, William) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 48 Declaration of Christopher A. Seidl in Support of #3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Complaint, filed byINVT SPE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Seidl, Christopher) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13951392.) filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Seidl, Christopher) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13951312.) filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Moore-Willis, Taylor) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13951288.) filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Harting, John) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #40 Stipulation For Order Changing Time & Order Thereon. Response due 12/6/2019.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INVT SPE LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF INVT Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Inventergy, LLC for INVT SPE LLC. (Carlson, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME & ORDER THEREON filed by INVT SPE LLC. (Carlson, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Charles Carlson for Defendant INVT SPE, LLC (Carlson, Steven) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. VLSI Technology LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Uniloc 2017 LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Seven Networks, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. IXI IP,LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. INVT SPE LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Inventergy Global, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Fortress Investment Group LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. Fortress Credit Co LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. DSS Technology Management, Inc. served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 28 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order denying #37 Motion to Relate Case 5:19-cv-06856-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on December 2, 2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Lauren Weber (Weber, Olivia) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Harbour (Harbour, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W. Hattenbach (Hattenbach, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Chu (Chu, Morgan) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Timothy D. Syrett representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph J. Mueller representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Leon B. Greenfield representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amanda L. Major representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William F. Lee representing Plaintiffs. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VLSI Technology LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF VLSI Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate NXP B.V., Other Affiliate Michael Stolarski for VLSI Technology LLC. (Ashley, Alvin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fortress Investment Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent SoftBank Group Corp., Other Affiliate MIC FH Aggregator LP for Fortress Investment Group LLC. (Ashley, Alvin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fortress Credit Co LLC identifying Corporate Parent Drawbridge Special Opportunities Fund LP for Fortress Credit Co LLC. (Ashley, Alvin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byFortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, VLSI Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ashley, Alvin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Timothy D. Syrett ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13917267.) filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Syrett, Timothy) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joseph J. Mueller ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13917241.) filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mueller, Joseph) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Leon B. Greenfield ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13917222.) filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Greenfield, Leon) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Amanda L. Major ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13915588.) filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Major, Amanda) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William F. Lee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13915551.) filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lee, William) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to DSS Technology Management, Inc., Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, INVT SPE LLC, IXI IP,LLC, Intel Corporation, Inventergy Global, Inc., Seven Networks, LLC, Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., Uniloc USA, Inc., VLSI Technology LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Intel Corporation. Responses due by 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Intel Corporation. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent and No Publicly Held Corporation Owns 10% or More of Its Stock for Apple Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Complaint, filed by Apple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Complaint)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/4/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DSS Technology Management, Inc., Fortress Credit Co LLC, Fortress Investment Group LLC, INVT SPE LLC, IXI IP,LLC, Inventergy Global, Inc., Seven Networks, LLC, Uniloc 2017 LLC, Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L., Uniloc USA, Inc., VLSI Technology LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13911053.). Filed byApple Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intel Corporation et al v. Fortress Investment Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Timothy Davis Syrett
Represented By: Leon Greenfield
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Major
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Liv Leila Herriot
Represented By: Joseph J. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Timothy Davis Syrett
Represented By: Leon Greenfield
Represented By: Amanda Leigh Major
Represented By: William F. Lee
Represented By: Liv Leila Herriot
Represented By: Joseph J. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VLSI Technology LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Michael David Harbour
Represented By: Alvin Matthew Ashley
Represented By: Olivia Lauren Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniloc USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eyler Dean
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniloc 2017 LLC
Represented By: James J. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IXI IP,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Credit Co LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Michael David Harbour
Represented By: Alvin Matthew Ashley
Represented By: Olivia Lauren Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.R.L.
Represented By: Eyler Dean
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSS Technology Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Holland
Represented By: Nathaniel H. Lipanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVEN Networks, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Kirk Dillman
Represented By: Seth Raymond Hasenour
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Kevin R. Schubert
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: John Christopher Briody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventergy Global, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Charles Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVT SPE LLC
Represented By: Christopher Anthony Seidl
Represented By: Eric Phillip Barstad
Represented By: John K Harting
Represented By: William V. Reiss
Represented By: Steven Charles Carlson
Represented By: Taylor Ymani Moore-Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortress Investment Group LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hattenbach
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Michael David Harbour
Represented By: Alvin Matthew Ashley
Represented By: Olivia Lauren Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?