Denning et al v. Loud Buddha, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Casey Denning and Natalia Cole
Defendant: Loud Buddha, LLC and Pura Cali Management Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07665
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #52 DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2020)
October 29, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Dismissal filed by Loud Buddha, LLC. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/29/2020)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/23/2020. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held telephonic on 7/23/2020.Court to Issue Case Management Scheduling Order.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Trenton Kashima, Jesse Young - Telephonic. Defendant Attorney: Jessica Linehan, Gladys Rodriguez-Morales - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 49 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT/RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPura Cali Management Corp.. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byLoud Buddha, LLC. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT by Loud Buddha, LLC. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 GENERAL ORDER FOR ALL PENDING CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE RICHARD SEEBORG. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for April 23, 2020 is continued to July 23, 2020 at 11:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Case Management Statement due by July 16, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE #42 Joint Stipulation Regarding Tolling FLSA Claims. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/31/2020. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Tolling FLSA Claims filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for March 19, 2020 is continued to April 23, 2020 at 11:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. Case Management Statement due by April 16, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT /RULE 26(f) REPORT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #37 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended FLSA Collective Action/Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 11, 2020 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended FLSA Collective Action / Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2 filed by Pura Cali Management Corp.. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 36 TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: The Initial Case Management Conference set for March 19, 2020 will be held at 11:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Initial Case Management Conference filed by Pura Cali Management Corp.. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION/CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. Filed byCasey Denning, Natalia Cole. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying #25 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning of Intent to File a First Amended Complaint (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiff Casey Denning (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiff Natalia Cole (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Loud Buddha (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loud Buddha, LLC (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loud Buddha, LLC (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Loud Buddha, LLC re #25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Pura Cali Management Corp.. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an in-person Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #3, 17th Floor, in San Francisco before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. If either party so desires, however, counsel may file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am, in which case the Conference will be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically for all parties, and all parties must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) Modified on 1/16/2020 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 01/16/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pura Cali Management Corp... (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION / CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) filed by Pura Cali Management Corp., Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 1/10/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Loud Buddha, LLC.. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT LOUD BUDDHA, LLC Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, et al shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Request to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by Loud Buddha, LLC, Casey Denning and Natalia Cole. (Leitzinger, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/7/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Pura Cali Management Corp. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. Loud Buddha, LLC served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT PURA CALI MANAGEMENT CORP. Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/14/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to FLSA Collective Action / Class Action Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Pura Cali Management Corp., Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Linehan, Jessica) (Filed on 12/26/2019) Modified on 12/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Jesse L. Young's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Jesse L. Young ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13953157.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Young, Jesse) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Stoops (Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Loud Buddha, LLC, Pura Cali Management Corp. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Proposed Summons. The summons should NOT be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. The correct event can be found at Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Proposed Summons. Please re-file the SUMMONS ONLY in its entirety. Re:[1-2] Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, [1-3] Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp. filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge initials are missing. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the initials on future filings. The judges initials are DMR. Re:[5 ] Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning, #4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Kevin J. Stoops ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13918127.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #4 Kevin J. Stoops's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019).
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning.. (Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission - Kevin J. Stoops ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13918127.) filed by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Stoops, Kevin) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Natalia Cole, Casey Denning OF 1ST FILING OF CONSENTS TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consents to Join Collective Action)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FLSA COLLECTIVE ACTION/CLASS ACTION with jury demand against Loud Buddha, LLC, Pura Cali Management Corp. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13913666.). Filed by Casey Denning, Natalia Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Loud Buddha, LLC, #3 Summons Defendant Pura Cali Management Corp.)(Kashima, Trenton) (Filed on 11/21/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denning et al v. Loud Buddha, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Denning
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Jesse L Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Cole
Represented By: Trenton Ross Kashima
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Represented By: Jesse L Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loud Buddha, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. Leitzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pura Cali Management Corp.
Represented By: Jessica L. Linehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?