Loran K. v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois
Plaintiff: LORAN K.
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS
Case Number: 3:2019cv07694
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Loran K. Do not enter parties in all capitalized Lett ering. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gwendolyn C. Payton representing Defendants. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Gwendolyn C. Payton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14065554.) filed by BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/14/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith (Smith, Mehrnaz) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LORAN K... (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/23/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF THE EMPLOYEE RETIREMENT INCOME SECURITY ACT OF 1974 (ERISA); ENFORCEMENT AND CLARIFICATION OF RIGHTS; PREJUDGMENT AND POSTJUDGMENT INTEREST; AND ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS against BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13917293.). Filed byLORAN K.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 11/22/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loran K. v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE CROSS AND BLUE SHIELD OF ILLINOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORAN K.
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?