Shapiro Associates v. Yang et al
Plaintiff: Shapiro Associates
Defendant: Sharon L. Menzie, Sharon L. Dionne, Soon Tae Yang, Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased, Mi J. Yang, Grace Kim, Estate Of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased, Katherine Buck, Sue Biancalana, William Buck, Sharon L. Menzie also known as Sharon L. Dionne doing business as Norge Laundry Village doing business as Sunshine Center, Soon Tae Yang doing business as Think Clean Cleaners, Mi J. Yang doing business as Think Clean Cleaners, Grace Kim doing business as Think Clean Cleaners, William Buck doing business as Think Clean Cleaners, Katherine Buck doing business as Think Clean Cleaners and Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased doing business as Norge Laundry Village doing business as Sunshine Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv07721
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 46 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang.. (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint byMi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang. (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 Defendants Sharon Dionne and Sue Biancalana's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM of Defendants Sharon Dionne and Sue Biancalana against Shapiro Associates bySharon L. Menzie, Sue Biancalana. (Gilhuly, R.) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 42 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased. (Thorpe, Sara) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT GRACE KIM filed by Shapiro Associates. (Till, John) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 40 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS SOON TAE YANG AND MI J. YANG TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Mi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang. (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Soon Tae Yang and Mi J. Yang shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 6, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Griffin Herman for Defendants Soon Tae Yang and Mi J. Yang (Herman, Sean) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 37 Clerk's Notice: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Related documents(s) #35 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 36 ***Please disregard. Filed in error.*** CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Sharon Dionne and Sue Biancalana shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/17/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) Modified on 1/6/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/6/2020 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Grace Kim filed by Shapiro Associates. (Mariotti, Melanie) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Morgan Gilhuly (Gilhuly, R.) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 33 Clerk's Notice: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (Related documents(s) #31 , #32 )(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Katherine Buck filed by Shapiro Associates. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Default Against William Buck filed by Shapiro Associates. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sue Biancalana, Sharon L. Menzie.. (Metres, David) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased. (Thorpe, Sara) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants Sue Biancalana & Sharon L. Menzie shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/2/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Sue Biancalana, Sharon L. Menzie. (Metres, David) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Grace Kim served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shapiro Associates.. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/24/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased ex rel. Safeco Insurance Company of America (Till, John) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased ex re. Safeco Insurance Company of America (Till, John) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. William Buck served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Katherine Buck served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Mi J. Yang served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Soon Tae Yang served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased ex rel. Unigard Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. ex rel, Chicago Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased ex re. Chicago Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shapiro Associates. Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. ex rel, Chicago Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shapiro Associates re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Katherine Buck (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shapiro Associates re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased ex rel. Unigard Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shapiro Associates re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased ex rel. Chicago Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shapiro Associates re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased ex rel. Unigard Insurance Co. (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Shapiro Associates re #7 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased (Till, John) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sue Biancalana, Katherine Buck, William Buck, Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased, Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased, Grace Kim, Sharon L. Menzie, Mi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Till, John) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Shapiro Associates identifying Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Anne Bloom, Other Affiliate Northern Insurance Co. of New York, Other Affiliate Reliance Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Industrial Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Insurance Company of the West, Other Affiliate Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate CNA Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Yosemite Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Safeco Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Kookmin Best Insurance Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Irving Shapiro, Other Affiliate Gary Shapiro, Other Affiliate Elyse Karow, Other Affiliate Karen Shapiro, Other Affiliate Allan Shapiro, Other Affiliate RSR Trust f/b/o Irving Shapiro, Other Affiliate RSR Trust f/b/o Gary Shapiro, Other Affiliate Unigard Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Firemans Fund Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chicago Insurance Company, Other Affiliate United Pacific Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Great American Insurance Company for Shapiro Associates. (Till, John) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/6/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Till, John) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sue Biancalana, Katherine Buck, William Buck, Estate Of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased, Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased, Grace Kim, Sharon L. Menzie, Mi J. Yang, Soon Tae Yang. Filed byShapiro Associates. (Filing Fee $400; Receipt No. 0971-13919971) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Till, John) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shapiro Associates v. Yang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Menzie
Represented By: David M. Metres
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Dionne
Represented By: David M. Metres
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon Tae Yang
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Robert Biancalana, Deceased
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi J. Yang
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate Of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased
Represented By: Sara M. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Biancalana
Represented By: David M. Metres
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon L. Menzie also known as Sharon L. Dionne doing business as Norge Laundry Village doing business as Sunshine Center
Represented By: David M. Metres
Represented By: R. Morgan Gilhuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon Tae Yang doing business as Think Clean Cleaners
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mi J. Yang doing business as Think Clean Cleaners
Represented By: Samir J. Abdelnour
Represented By: Sean Griffin Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Kim doing business as Think Clean Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Buck doing business as Think Clean Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Buck doing business as Think Clean Cleaners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Raymond E. Menzie, Deceased doing business as Norge Laundry Village doing business as Sunshine Center
Represented By: Sara M. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shapiro Associates
Represented By: John Richard Till
Represented By: Melanie A. Mariotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?