Tekvoke, LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tekvoke, LLC
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07735
Filed: November 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/08/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 5, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Tekvoke, LLC.. (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2020)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 cmp)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/9/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 24, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2019) Modified on 11/25/2019 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/24/2019)
November 24, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Tekvoke, LLC . (Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/24/2019)
November 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RingCentral, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13921459.). Filed byTekvoke, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ritcheson, Steven) (Filed on 11/24/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tekvoke, LLC v. RingCentral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tekvoke, LLC
Represented By: Steven Whitefield Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?