Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000
Defendant: Reliable Express Transportation, Inc. and Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
3Rd Party Plaintiff: UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Asia Group PTE LTD and UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv07759
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by UPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc... (Estrella, Mark) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants UPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., and UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/17/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by UPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service Inc, Other Affiliate UPINSCO for UPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. re #14 Answer to Complaint (Estrella, Mark) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft, Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC. Filed byUPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc., UPS Asia Group PTE LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Estrella, Mark) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 CROSSCLAIM against Reliable Express Transportation, Inc.. Filed byUPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Estrella, Mark) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byUPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.. (Estrella, Mark) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 to UPS Supply Chain Solution (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 Reliable Express Transportation, Inc., a corporation (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 UPS Ocean Freight (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000.. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 identifying Other Affiliate Falvey Cargo Underwriting, Ltd., Other Affiliate Advance International, Inc. for Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000. (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/30/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UPS Asia Group PTE LTD. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Reliable Express Transportation, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/26/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 25, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0 901LC1819097000 Cause of Action is not a Miscellaneous Case the Correct Cause of Action is 28:1333 Admiralty. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES TO OCEAN CARGO; against Reliable Express Transportation, Inc., UPS Asia Group PTE LTD, UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc., UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13925122.). Filed byUnderwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 11/25/2019) Modified on 11/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/26/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000 v. UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Cover Note B0901LC1819097000
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Ocean Freight Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christoph Martin Wahner
Represented By: Mark Paul Estrella
Represented By: Michael Sullivan McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Asia Group PTE LTD
Represented By: Christoph Martin Wahner
Represented By: Mark Paul Estrella
Represented By: Michael Sullivan McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christoph Martin Wahner
Represented By: Mark Paul Estrella
Represented By: Michael Sullivan McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Express Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hapag-Lloyd (America) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?