Jensen v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Marc Jensen and Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr
Defendant: Anne Fullerton, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wells Fargo & Company, Eric Froelich and Brian Nini
Case Number: 3:2019cv07773
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA.. (Hutchins, Kristin) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Hutchins, Kristin) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint for Employment Discrimination filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Hutchins, Kristin) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/28/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr.. (Jensen, Marc) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Before the court authorized efiling, Mr. Jensen manually filed a declination to magistrate-judge jurisdiction, which was dated 12/30/2019 and was docketed by the clerk of court on 1/6/2020. (ECF No. 19). Then, on 1/2/2020, after the court authorized efiling, Mr. Jensen consented to the magistrate-judge jurisdiction. For a clear record, the court attaches a new consent form and asks Mr. Jensen to either consent to or decline magistrate-judge jurisdiction. Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. The court also attaches a consent form to this notice. The due date to file the form is 1/14/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Order terminating #18 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. E-filing has been authorized.
January 6, 2020 Filing 19 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #21 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr.. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) Modified on 1/7/2020 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing (BLANK) filed by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr. (Jensen, Marc) (Filed on 1/5/2020)
January 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr ASSIGNMENT OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO TRIAL AND BLANK CONSENT OR DECLINATION (Jensen, Marc) (Filed on 1/5/2020)
January 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, Consent Brochure (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment and Consent or Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction)(Jensen, Marc) (Filed on 1/5/2020)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Form 15. Certificate of Service for Electronic Filing of Attached Consent)(Jensen, Marc) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2020. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint , for an Extension of Time for Defendants Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank, NA to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Hutchins, Kristin) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin E. Hutchins (Hutchins, Kristin) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part #9 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Marc Jensen. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons Received from USMS. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
November 27, 2019 ***Delivered service packet to the U.S. Marshal Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom*** (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eric Froelich, Anne Fullerton, Brian Nini, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 attachment to summons, #2 USM 285, #3 USM 285, #4 USM 285, #5 USM 285, #6 USM 285)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Marc Jensen. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Froelich, Anne Fullerton, Brian Nini, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Filed byMarc Jensen. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Fullerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Kristin E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Kristin E. Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Froelich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Lawrence Jensen, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?