Frost v. Scharf et al
Plaintiff: Vinton Frost
Defendant: Sara Winslow, James Scharf, Brian Stretch, United States Attorney's Office, Alex Tse and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2019cv07774
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #7 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Scharf, Brian Stretch, Alex Tse, United States Attorney's Office, United States Department of Justice, Sara Winslow. Filed by Vinton Frost. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal filed by Vinton Frost. Responses due by 1/9/2020. Replies due by 1/16/2020. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/10/19. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vinton Frost.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Vinton Frost. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demand against James Scharf, Brian Stretch, Alex Tse, United States Attorney's Office, United States Department of Justice, Sara Winslow (Filing fee IFPP). Filed by Vinton Frost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Scharf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Scharf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stretch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Tse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinton Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?