Hartweck v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Rose Hartweck
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07783
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Illinois (Chicago), 1:19-cv-06737, Hartweck v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07783 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06737. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSFERRED to the California Northern District the electronic record. (nsf, )
November 26, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2741 Conditional Transfer Order filed 11/26/2019. (nsf, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of California. (nsf, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rose Hartweck. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 10/11/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Seidman, Daniel)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Rose Hartweck as to Monsanto Company. (Seidman, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 12/19/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Monsanto Company on 10/11/19 by Plaintiff Rose Hartweck. Waiver of service due by 12/10/2019. (Seidman, Daniel)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
October 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rose Hartweck; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16330416. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seidman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartweck v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Hartweck
Represented By: Daniel Robert Seidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?