Woodcock v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Woodcock
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07793
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Southern District of Georgia (Brunswick), 2:19-cv-00103 LGW BWC, Woodcock v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07793 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 159 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00103. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING #5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER insofar as it related to this action. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/18/2019. (ca)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/17/2019. (ca)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregory Woodcock. Monsanto Company served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Diamond, Seth)
August 30, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2675644. (ca)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f) INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 8/30/2019. (ca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Gregory Woodcock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodcock v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Woodcock
Represented By: Seth M. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?