Anderson v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Delbert Anderson
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv07795
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern District of Alabama (Northeastern), 5:19-cv-01612 LCB, Anderson v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-07795 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 168 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-01612. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern California for inclusion in MDL 2741; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern California. (AHI)
November 14, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3478418 (B4601102072). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Monsanto Company filed by Delbert Anderson.(AHI). (Sapone, Andrea)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Please use case number 5:19-cv-1612-LCB on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: the undersigned RECUSES himself from any further consideration of this case. The Clerk shall REASSIGN this action to another judge of this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/4/19. (BJL)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Monsanto Company filed by Delbert Anderson.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Anderson
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Sapone
Represented By: Annesley H DeGaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?