Stormborn Technologies, LLC v. Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07804
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Wernov. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Stormborn Technologies, LLC. Filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14081616.) filed by Stormborn Technologies, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/21/2020 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael Vincent. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Neil J. McNabnay. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 STIPULATION to reset deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 2/4/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/15/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 25 EXHIBITS re #19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028138.) filed byTopcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) #19 ) (McNabnay, Neil) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 EXHIBITS re #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028172.) filed byTopcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Vincent, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Ricardo Bonilla. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 14, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Stormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 1/14/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028172.) filed by Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Vincent, Michael) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028161.) filed by Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Bonilla, Ricardo) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14028138.) filed by Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (McNabnay, Neil) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 18 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Topcon Corporation, Corporate Parent Topcon America Corporation for Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc., Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Talebi, Rodeen) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 17 Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Stormborn Technologies, LLC byTopcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (Talebi, Rodeen) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 1/14/2020. Replies due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Talebi, Rodeen) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodeen Talebi (Talebi, Rodeen) (Filed on 12/31/2019)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/30/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk. Signed by Judge Clerk on 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stormborn Technologies, LLC.. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Stormborn Technologies, LLC shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/30/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/25/2020 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2019. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Stormborn Technologies, LLC (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019) Modified on 11/29/2019 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Stormborn Technologies, LLC . (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. RE44,199, #2 Exhibit B - Exemplary Claim Chart)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13932779.). Filed byStormborn Technologies, LLC. (Anderson, Kirk) (Filed on 11/27/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stormborn Technologies, LLC v. Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Topcon Positioning Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Rodeen Talebi
Represented By: Ricardo J. Bonilla
Represented By: Michael Alden Vincent
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stormborn Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Kirk J. Anderson
Represented By: Howard L Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?