Crawford v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Crawford
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc, Altria Group Inc. and Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv07850
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 MEMBER CASE OPENED: Michigan Eastern, 1:19-cv-13318-TLL-PTM, Crawford v. Juul Labs, Inc., et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:19-cv-7797-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 13 cc: JPMDL (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-13318. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2913 (SSch)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2913. (SSch)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-13) for MDL # 2913. [Informational Copy] (SSch)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Altria Group, Inc. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Juul Labs, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Tyler Crawford of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant PAX Labs, Inc. (Miller, E.)
November 13, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued for *Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. * (DAll)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Avern Cohn* and *Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti* to District Judge Thomas L. Ludington and Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris (SSch)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon S. Almonrode on behalf of Tyler Crawford. (Almonrode, Sharon)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Tyler Crawford against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7481333 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Midland - County Where Action Arose: Midland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 2:19-cv-13014, Judge Laurie J. Michelson] (Miller, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Crawford
Represented By: E. Powell Miller
Represented By: Sharon S. Almonrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?